THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 1:00:41 AM
Lucas, William John
CPSO#:
29277
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
17 Jul 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jun 1977
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Records pertaining to coroner investigations will be available by contacting the Office of the Regional Supervising Coroner, Central West Region.
25 Morton Shulman Avenue, Toronto ON M3M 0B1 Tel: (6470 329-1825
email: [email protected]
Date Received: 16 Jul 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1983 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jun 1976 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 1977 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 17 Jul 2021 |