THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 21:15:22 PM
Wu, Sing Man
CPSO#:
29261
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
31 Dec 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
27 Sep 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English
Education: University of Toronto, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. S.M. Wu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 24 2018
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Record inquires should be directed to RSRS Medical Records Management & Inforrmatics
RSRS Medical Records Management & Informatics
111 St. Regis Crescent S
Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6
1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 25 Jan 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 1977 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 27 Sep 2017 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 27 Sep 2017 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2017 |