THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
17/04/24 22:59:25 PM
Keefe, Peter Huntley
CPSO#:
29193
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Jul 1983
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Jul 1983
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
600 University Ave
Department of Psychiatry
Mount Sinai Hospital
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Phone: 416 729 3326
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:09 Jun 1981 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Psychiatry |
Effective:06 Jun 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PETER HUNTLEY KEEFE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEEFE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1976 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jun 1977 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 10 Dec 1980 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jul 1983 |