THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 7:51:15 AM
Dodgson, Bruce Gordon
CPSO#:
29172
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jul 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
17 Jun 1977
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Bruce G. Dodgson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 22 2016
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:The Hospital For Sick Children, 555 University Avenue, Toronto, ON, M5G 1X8
Date Received: 21 Apr 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:01 Jan 1981 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1977 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2016 |