THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 15:23:12 PM
Rajchgot, Percy
CPSO#:
29165
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Jun 1977
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Percy Rajchgot Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 1 2022
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Boomerang Health 9401 Jane St. Suite 211, Vaughan, Ontario L6A 4H7. Patients not registered with Boomerang Health and looking for a copy of their records may contact: Record Storage and Retrieval Services Inc. (RSRS) at 416-398-0638 0r 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 01 Jun 2022
Instructions/Address:Boomerang Health
9401 Jane St
Suite 211
Vaughan, ON L6A 4H7
Date Received: 21 Nov 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:08 Jun 1981 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1977 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2022 |