THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 16:28:48 PM
Frith, Russell Harold
CPSO#:
29078
MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of
28 Jun 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
18 May 1977
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Occupational Medicine |
Effective:08 Nov 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1975 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Jun 1976 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 May 1977 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 03 Jun 2002 |
Revoked: Discipline Committee. |
Effective: 28 Jun 2002 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 28 Jun 2002
Summary:
On June 28, 2002, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, having found Dr. Russell Harold Frith guilty of professional misconduct in that he engaged in the sexual abuse of a patient contrary to s.51(1)(b.1) of the Code, the Committee makes the following order as to the penalty and costs. The Discipline Committee orders and directs:
1. Dr. Frith to appear before the Committee to be reprimanded and the reprimand to be recorded.
2. The Registrar to revoke Dr. Frith(s certificate of registration effective immediately.
3. Dr. Frith to reimburse the College for funding provided for the patient under the program required under s.85.7 of the Code.
4. Dr. Frith to post security by way of an irrevocable letter of credit in the amount of $10,000.00 to guarantee the payment of any amounts Dr. Frith maybe required to reimburse the College under the order made in paragraph 3; and
5. Dr. Frith pay to the College costs in the amount of $2,500.00 within 60 days of June 28, 2002.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Appeal Decision Date: 2002-09-05
Hearing Date(s): Jun 28, 2002