THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 17:23:14 PM
Krop, Jozef
CPSO#:
29036
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
27 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Jan 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Polish
Education: Academy of Medicine, Cracow, 1968
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St. Regis Crescent S.
Toronto, Ontario
M3J 1Y6
Tel: (416) 398-0638
Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732
Fax: (416) 398-5932
Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 28 Jul 2010
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Nov 1973 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1975 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Apr 1977 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 30 Jan 2002 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 30 Jan 2002 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 27 Jul 2010 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 23 Dec 1998
Summary:
In December 1998, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Krop guilty of professional misconduct as defined in Ontario Regulation 548/90, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, contrary to s. 29(22).
On June 22, 1999, the Discipline Committee ordered the following penalty:
1) A reprimand, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register;
2) Dr. Krop(s certificate of registration is to be subject to the following conditions:
(a) Dr. Krop is required to adhere to the 11 recommendations with respect to members, from the Report of the Ad Hoc Committee on Complementary Medicine, for assessing patients, treating patients and advancing knowledge;
(b) In addition, prior to any use of Vega testing, provocation neutralization testing, serial dilution end point titration testing for non-inhalant sensitivities including candida-related sensitivity, and hair analysis when not used in the diagnosis of heavy metal toxicity or essential element deficiency, Dr. Krop:
(I) is required to provide to the patient sufficient information to make informed choices;
(ii) is required not to misrepresent information or opinion; and
(iii) is required to give the patient the general degree of certainty or uncertainty of efficacy of the test(s), notwithstanding his individual beliefs.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 2002-01-30
Hearing Date(s): Apr 27, 1998
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: October 13, 2010
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. Jozef Krop to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:
I, Dr. Jozef Krop, undertake never to apply for a license with the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario.