THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 9:21:56 AM
McCabe, Philip Charles
CPSO#:
29005
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Dec 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Dec 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
102-745 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge ON N1R 0B6
Phone: 51927459754
Fax: 2266668966
Electoral District: 03
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Philip C. McCabe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 8 2020
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients seeking access to their medical record can contact: Southwest Ontario Aboriginal Health Centre, 425-427 William Street, London ON N6B 3E1, Tel: 519-672-4079.
Date Received: 26 Nov 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1983 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PHILIP CHARLES MCCABE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCABE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1975 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1976 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Oct 1976 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Mar 1977 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jan 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Dec 2021 |