THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 19:17:54 PM
Rusthoven, James Jacob
CPSO#:
28987
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
06 Mar 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
11 Mar 1977
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Illinois, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill St
Brantford ON N3R 1G9
Date Received: 06 Mar 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:24 Nov 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:05 Sep 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1975 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Mar 1977 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 06 Mar 2020 |