THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 15:04:01 PM
Mussani, Anil Mendi
CPSO#:
28985
MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of
14 Dec 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Jul 1975
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1975 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Mar 1977 |
Revoked: Discipline Committee. |
Effective: 14 Dec 1999 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 03 Dec 1998
Summary:
The Discipline hearing commenced on November 30, whereby Dr. Mussani entered a plea of no contest to all the allegations in relation to one of the complainants. On December 3, 1998, the Discipline Committee accepted as correct, certain facts alleged against Dr. Mussani as set out in the Notice of Hearing and the Statement of Agreed Facts, and found him guilty of professional misconduct in that he sexually abused a patient and that he engaged in sexual impropriety. He was also found guilty of professional misconduct in that he engaged in acts relevant to the practice of medicine that having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.
With regard to a second complainant, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Mussani guilty of professional misconduct in that he sexually abused this patient, and engaged in acts relevant to the practice of medicine that having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.
In December 1999, the Discipline Committee directs the Registrar to revoke Dr. Mussani(s certificate of registration effective immediately. As well, the Committee ordered a reprimand, the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the register.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 2003-04-30
Hearing Date(s): Oct 19, 1998