THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 4:30:29 AM
Baillie, Frank George
CPSO#:
28960
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
04 Sep 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Mar 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, German
Education: University of Glasgow School of Medicine, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Frank Baillie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 19 2007
Corporation Name: Frank Baillie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 22 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:12 Nov 1979 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Specified Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 1974 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1975 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Feb 1977 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 2020 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 2020 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 04 Sep 2020 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: March 1, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Frank George Baillie to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 1, 2020:
Dr. Baillie has retired from his general surgery consultation practice, and has voluntarily agreed to restrict to practising as a surgical assistant under the direction of a qualified surgeon.