THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
17/04/24 16:22:19 PM
Nanka-Bruce, Richard Henry Merton
CPSO#:
28910
MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of
22 Mar 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
31 Mar 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of London, 1970
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jan 1977 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 31 Mar 2003 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 31 Mar 2003 |
Terms and conditions amended by Executive Committee |
Effective: 11 Dec 2003 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee |
Effective: 16 Mar 2006 |
Revoked: Discipline Committee. |
Effective: 22 Mar 2006 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 22 Mar 2006
Summary:
On March 22, 2006, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Nanka Bruce to have committed acts of professional misconduct in that he has been found guilty of offences that are relevant to his suitability to practise, those offences being, two counts of indecent assault and two counts of sexual assault involving four patients, imposed by the Superior Court of Justice on January 13, 2006. The assaults took place in his office, during what purported to be clinical examinations. The Committee ordered that Dr. Nanka-Bruce's certificate of registration be revoked immediately.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Mar 22, 2006
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 31 Mar 2003
Summary:
On March 31, 2003, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Nanka-Bruce to have committed an act of professional misconduct relevant to the practice of medicine that having regard to all the circumstances would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.
The Committee ordered the following penalty:
1) Dr. Nanka-Bruce attend befored the panel to be reprimanded, the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register.
2) That a condition or limitation be imposed on the certificate of registration of Dr. Nanka- Bruce that he not conduct any physical examinations of female patients except in the presence of a third party who is at leat 21 years of age and is acceptable to the Registrar of the College.
3) That Dr. Nanka-Bruce may apply to the College for a variation or revocation of the condition set out in paragraph 2 above, which application shall be made no earlier than one year after the date of this order.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Mar 31, 2003