THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 22:06:30 PM
Mehta, Suryakant Dipchand
CPSO#:
28903
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
02 Jan 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
21 Dec 1976
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati, Hindi, Urdu
Education: Baroda University, 1969
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Suryakant Mehta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 16 2016
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Please contact Dr. Osama Shabash for medical record inquiries.
815 College Street
1st Floor
Toronto, ON M6G 1C9
4165331145
Date Received: 05 Feb 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Dec 1974 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Dec 1976 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Jan 2016 |