THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 16:47:20 PM
Quevillon, Joseph Albert Jean
CPSO#:
28901
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jan 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Jul 1971
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Quevillon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 13 2015
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
Accuro
Unit 1B
700 Industrial Avenue
Ottawa ON K1G 0Y9
Website: http://www.accuro.ca
Telephone: (613) - 738-1242
Fax: (613) - 738-0562
Date Received: 18 Dec 2014
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:09 Nov 1976 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:24 Nov 1976 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1971 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Dec 1976 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jan 2015 |