THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 13:27:54 PM
Tlusty, Eva
CPSO#:
28829
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
06 Jun 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
21 Oct 1976
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Czech, English
Education: Charles Univ Prague Faculty Paediatrics, 1966
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Gam X Ray
DG Imaging
18 Kensington Rd
Unit 206
Brampton, ON L6T 4S5
Date Received: 06 Jun 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:25 Nov 1981 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Nov 1973 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Nov 1974 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 1975 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Oct 1976 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 06 Jun 2017 |