THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 6:20:13 AM
Siebert, Lee Francis
CPSO#:
28716
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Aug 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
24 Aug 1976
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Lee F. Siebert Medicine, Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 16 2016
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Command Document Storage and Records Management
100 Piccadilly Street
London, ON N6A 1R8
Tel: 519 672 1460
Fax: 519 672 8096
Date Received: 14 Jul 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:16 Nov 1977 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1973 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1976 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Aug 1976 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Aug 2015 |