THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 4:02:35 AM
McKibbin, Timothy Giles
CPSO#:
28658
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
09 Jan 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
16 Aug 1976
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: T. G. McKibbin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 27 2017
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:201-1370 Clyde Avenue, Ottawa, ON K2E 3H8
Date Received: 09 Jan 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:11 Jun 1980 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:02 Dec 1981 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Aug 1976 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 09 Jan 2017 |