THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 11:25:18 AM
Nehra, Lollita Juliette
CPSO#:
28655
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
07 Sep 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
18 Nov 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Toronto, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1974 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Aug 1976 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 Nov 2009 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 18 Nov 2009 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 07 Sep 2011 |
Concerns
Source:
Executive Committee
Active Date: November 18, 2009
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Lollita Juliette Nehra has ceased to practise medicine in all jurisdictions.