THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 9:09:39 AM
Beattie, Robert Alan
CPSO#:
28645
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
03 Nov 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
18 Dec 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Robert A. Beattie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 20 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:9631 Hwy 62 N
RR4
Stirling ON K0K 3E0
Date Received: 06 Nov 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1975 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Aug 1976 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 Dec 2013 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 18 Dec 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 01 Sep 2015 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 03 Nov 2018 |