THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
17/04/24 23:12:44 PM
Sirek, Ann Maria Theresia
CPSO#:
28639
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jan 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Aug 1976
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Slovak
Education: University of Toronto, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Ann Sirek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 2 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:17 Nov 1978 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1974 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Aug 1976 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jan 2022 |