THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 1:07:27 AM
Beresford, John Spencer
CPSO#:
28622
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
07 Jul 1994
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of London, 1953
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:01 Jan 1977 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Aug 1976 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 07 Jul 1994 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 12 Apr 1994
Summary:
In September 1993, Dr. Beresford pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, contrary to s. 27(21); in that he committed sexual impropriety with a patient, contrary to s. 27(29); and in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, contrary to s. 27(32). The Discipline Committee accepted this plea, and found Dr. Beresford guilty of professional misconduct. Consequently, in April 1994 the Committee ordered that Dr. Beresford be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register. In addition, the Committee ruled that the Doctor's practice be restricted to male patients; that he be required to attend sessions with a psychiatrist at least every three weeks for at least three months and thereafter no less frequently than every four weeks; that the psychiatrist must be acceptable to the Registrar; that the psychiatrist must submit quarterly reports to the Registrar stating that Dr. Beresford was compliant and stable; and that the psychiatrist must report immediately any deviation that might jeopardize the public.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Sep 07, 1993