THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 5:08:12 AM
Druck, Maurice Nathan
CPSO#:
28619
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
14 Oct 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Aug 1976
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
14-Oct-2021
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Yiddish
Education: University of Toronto, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: M.N. Druck Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 15 2022
Corporation Name: Maurice Druck Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2016
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Records Management Ltd.
Unit 13
1 High Meadow Place
Toronto, ON M9L 0A3
Tel: 1 800 775 0093
Date Received: 28 Jul 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:12 Nov 1979 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:01 Dec 1981 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1975 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Aug 1976 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 14 Oct 2021 |