THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 19:51:49 PM
McAlister, Neil Harding
CPSO#:
28603
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
04 Feb 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Aug 1976
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: McAlister Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 4 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Contact former practice above
2202 Jane Street
North York, ON
M3M 1A4
416 614 7999
Date Received: 02 Oct 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:18 Nov 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Geriatric Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Geriatric Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1975 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Aug 1976 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 04 Feb 2021 |