THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 4:36:37 AM
Black, William Patrick Galloway
CPSO#:
28602
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
03 Nov 1982
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Irish Conjoint Board, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. William Black Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 1 2013
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:-For patients that saw Dr. Black at 528 College Street, Toronto, ON, M6G 1A6, contact Records Storage and Retrieval Services at 111 St. Regis Crescent South, Toronto, ON, M3J 1Y6, 1-888-563-3732 (phone), 416-398-5932 (fax), www.recordsolution.ca.
-For patients that saw Dr. Black at the Queen West Community Health Centre, at 168 Bathurst Street, Toronto, ON, M5V 2R4, 416-703-8480 (phone), contact the health centre directly.
Date Received: 21 Jul 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1977 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 1972 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 1973 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 12 Dec 1974 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Aug 1976 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 19 Jul 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Nov 1982 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2017 |