THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 15:13:03 PM
Ireland, Eric John
CPSO#:
28569
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
27 Jun 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
31 Aug 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may send a request by email to: [email protected].
Date Received: 26 Jun 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1975 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1976 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jul 1976 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 27 Feb 1981 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Feb 1981 |
Terms and conditions amended by Executive Committee |
Effective: 12 Nov 1996 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Feb 1999 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 07 Sep 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Dec 2012 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 29 Jan 2019 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member |
Effective: 29 Jan 2019 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Apr 2021 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 31 Aug 2022 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member |
Effective: 31 Aug 2022 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Apr 2023 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 27 Jun 2023 |
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: June 27, 2023
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Eric John Ireland to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 27, 2023:
Dr. Ireland has resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)
Source:
Member
Active Date: August 31, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Eric John Ireland to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective August 31, 2022:
Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Ireland’s knowledge, skill and judgment. As a result: Dr. Ireland will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 6 months. Dr. Ireland will engage in professional education in medical recordkeeping and certain clinical issues. Dr. Ireland’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College approximately 6 months following the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.