THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 7:52:56 AM
Rogers, Stephen Ernest
CPSO#:
28554
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
07 Aug 1984
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Dec 1982
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: University of Glasgow School of Medicine, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:24 Nov 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1977 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1975 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Jun 1976 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1976 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jul 1976 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Dec 1981 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Dec 1982 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 07 Aug 1984 |