THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 5:25:03 AM
Henry, David Anthony
CPSO#:
28547
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
10 Aug 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Sep 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of the West Indies, 1967
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Dr. Henry is retiring from office practice on June 30, 2016. Patients may contact RSRS at above address for records.
RSRS Canada
111 St Regis Crescent South
Toronto M3J 1Y6
1 888 563 3732 extension 230
Ms. Pauline Stewart, Manager, Physician Services
Date Received: 28 Apr 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jul 1976 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 30 Sep 2016 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 30 Sep 2016 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 10 Aug 2017 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: September 30, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. David Anthony Henry to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective September 30, 2016:
Dr. Henry has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine due to retirement and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.