THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 17:33:52 PM
Mughal, Maqbool Ahmed
CPSO#:
28522
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
05 Jun 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Swahili, Urdu
Education: University College of East Africa, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
Docudavit Solutions Incorporated
28 Eugene Street
Toronto ON M6B 3Z4
Website: http://docudavit.com
Toll Free: 1-888-781-9083
Date Received: 31 May 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jul 1976 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Jun 2015 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 05 Jun 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Quality Assurance Committee |
Effective: 23 Jun 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 16 Feb 2016 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2016 |