THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 14:00:50 PM
Tadros, Monir
CPSO#:
28506
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Aug 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
15 Jul 1976
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1963
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Monir Latif Tadros Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 22 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Records Management
13 - 1 High Meadow Place
Toronto ON M9L 0A3
Date Received: 03 Jun 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:31 Mar 1979 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 1976 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Aug 2019 |