THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 21:13:40 PM
Degani, Cassim Tayebbhai
CPSO#:
28501
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Jun 1979
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Nov 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati, Hindi, Urdu
Education: University of Bombay, 1963
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Shouldice Hospital
7750 Bayview Avenue
Thornhill On.L3T 4A3
Thornhill ON L3T 4A3
Phone: 905 889 1125
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
Shouldice Hospital Ltd. |
Markham |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:03 Nov 1975 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CASSIM TAYEBBHAI DEGANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEGANI is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jul 1972 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1973 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1976 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 1976 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 15 Nov 1978 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jun 1979 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Oct 2008 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 20 Oct 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 05 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Nov 2011 |