THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 7:09:55 AM
Kundi, Pran Jivan
CPSO#:
28482
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
26 Feb 2024
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Jul 1976
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: Nishtar Medical College, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1985 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jul 1976 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 26 Feb 2024 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: February 26, 2024
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Pran Jivan Kundi to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 26th, 2024:
A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Kundi’s engaged in professional misconduct. During the investigation, Dr. Kundi resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)