THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 20:13:19 PM
Goldsmith, William Oliver
CPSO#:
28439
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
04 Dec 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
15 Jun 1975
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: William Goldsmith Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 20 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Paitents seeking a copy of their medical record may contact Dr. Pooja Kaushik (110119) at:
1 - 33 Farely Dr
Guelph ON N1L 0B7
or
Tel: 519-837-8137
Date Received: 05 Dec 2018
Instructions/Address:1-33 Farley Dr
Guelph ON N1L 0B7
Date Received: 04 Dec 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1977 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1975 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jul 1976 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 04 Dec 2018 |