THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 17:30:32 PM
Finlayson, Judith Elizabeth
CPSO#:
28434
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
21 Jul 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 May 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, German
Education: McMaster University, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:RSRS
www.GetMyMedRecord.ca
or
Phone: 1-888-563-3732 Ext 1
Date Received: 19 May 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1986 |
CFPC Specialist |
FCFP - Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Dec 2004 |
CFPC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1975 to 13 Jun 1976
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1976 to 31 Dec 1976
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 10 Jan 1977 to 04 Jul 1977
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1975 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 1976 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jan 1981 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Mar 1982 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 21 Jun 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 May 2007 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 21 Jul 2021 |