THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 11:06:45 AM
Sacco, Michael Francis
CPSO#:
28409
MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of
17 Jul 1987
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: University of Toronto, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 1976 |
Revoked: Discipline Committee. |
Effective: 17 Jul 1987 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 12 Nov 1987
Summary:
The Discipline Committee found Dr. Sacco guilty of professional misconduct in that he engaged in sexual impropriety with a patient pursuant to s.60 of the Health Disciplines Act and that he engaged in conduct or anact relevant to the practice of medicine that having regard to all the cirucmstnaces would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, pursuant to s.60(3)(c) of the Health Discipline Act.
As of the date of this hearing, November 12, 1987, Dr. Sacco was not a member of the College, although he had been a member at the time of the offences of professional misconduct as found by the Committee to have occurred. Counsel advised the Committee and the Committee accepted that in such circumstances, the Committee did not have jurisdiction to make a disciplinary order under section 60 of the Act.
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 12 Nov 1987
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 30 May 1986
Summary:
In May 1986, Dr. Sacco pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 60(3)(a) of the Health Disciplines Act, 1980, as amended, in that he had been found guilty of an offence relevant to his suitability to practice. The Discipline Committee accepted this plea and found Dr. Sacco guilty of professional misconduct. Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Sacco's licence to practice be revoked.
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 1987-09-23
Hearing Date(s): 30 May 1986