THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 4:57:25 AM
Robertson, Archibald
CPSO#:
28369
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
04 Jun 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
28 Feb 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Glasgow School of Medicine, 1953
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:19 Nov 1969 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Aug 1960 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1976 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 Feb 1987 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 28 Feb 1987 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 04 Jun 1999 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 28 Feb 1986
Summary:
In February 1986, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Robertson guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 27(21) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Robertson be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register; that his licence to practice be suspended for a period of three months; and that, if the Doctor failed to attend for his reprimand, the period of suspension would be extended a further three months. The Committee also ruled that following the three month suspension, a restriction be placed on Dr. Robertson's licence, prohibiting him from practicing surgery.
Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Hearing Date(s): 26 Feb 1986