THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 6:26:42 AM
Cutbush, Wesley Shier
CPSO#:
28365
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Jun 1976
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Sep 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
140 Centennial Parkway N
Hamilton ON L8E 1H9
Phone: (905) 561-9255
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Wesley Shier Cutbush Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 2 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1977 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. WESLEY SHIER CUTBUSH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CUTBUSH is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1975 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 1976 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Apr 2007 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 03 Apr 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Sep 2007 |