THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 0:08:53 AM
Kenyon, Cynthia Florence
CPSO#:
28356
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
02 May 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Jun 1983
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
24 Bellevue Ave
London ON N6C 4A6
Electoral District: 02
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: C. F. Kenyon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 2 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:22 Nov 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 1976 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 29 Nov 1978 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 29 Nov 1978 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1983 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 May 2022 |