THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 16:30:17 PM
Halpenny, John Stirling
CPSO#:
28255
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Jun 1984
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Jun 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Superior Medical Consultants
1140 Crosspointe Lane
Suite 7
Webster NY 14580
United States
Phone: 8663218717
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:19 Nov 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOHN STIRLING HALPENNY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HALPENNY is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1975 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jun 1976 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 24 Feb 1977 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Feb 1977 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1977 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 1981 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jun 1984 |