THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 17:29:56 PM
Kuprowski, Gary Nicholas
CPSO#:
28227
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
02 Sep 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Jun 1976
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Gary Kuprowski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients seeking access to a copy of their medical record can contact Dr. Armin Mulaosmanovic: 3335 Dougall Ave., Suite 103A, Windsor, ON., N9E 1S8, Telephone: 519-969-0580
Date Received: 03 Nov 2020
Instructions/Address:
Patients should contact the following address to request a copy of their file: 600 Norfolk Street, Windsor ON, N9E 1H1, Ph (519) 969-0580, Fax (519) 966-1901
Date Received: 16 Oct 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1976 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Sep 2021 |