THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 23:24:30 PM
Tomarken, James Lynn
CPSO#:
28226
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Jun 1976
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Jun 1976
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
30 Pineview Ln
Coram NY 11727-5103
United States
Phone: 631-374-5179
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California
USA - Connecticut
USA - New York
USA - Pennsylvania
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:09 Jun 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JAMES LYNN TOMARKEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOMARKEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1975 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1976 |