THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 2:08:34 AM
Wong, Peter Nathenial
CPSO#:
28205
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
15 Jun 1976
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Peter N. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 15 2016
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Former patients should mail their requests
20 Sunninghill Drive, Port Dover, ON, N0A 1N6
Date Received: 15 Jul 2016
Instructions/Address:Medical Record requests can be made by mail to:
Dr. Peter N. Wong
Dr. Peter N. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
PO Box 1029
Port Dover ON N0A 1N0
Or by fax to 519-583-2776
Date Received: 12 Nov 2014
Instructions/Address:Please send request for medical records by fax to 519 583 2814
Date Received: 04 Jul 2014
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1975 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1976 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2016 |