THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 7:52:07 AM
Pelz, David Michael
CPSO#:
28203
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1976
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Jun 1976
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
Department Of Diagnostic Radiology
339 Windermere Road
London ON N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 32429
Fax: (519) 663-8803
Electoral District: 02
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Pelz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 26 2022
Corporation Name: Lee Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 20 2017
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Chatham Public General Hospital Society |
Chatham |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Stratford General Hospital |
Stratford |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:25 Nov 1981 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVID MICHAEL PELZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PELZ is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1975 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Jun 1976 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1976 |