THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 6:07:49 AM
Bourdeau, Gilles Viateur
CPSO#:
28196
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
09 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
10 Jun 1976
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1970
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Accuro Inc., Suite 411 1230 Old Innes Road, Ottawa, ON K1B 3V3
Date Received: 08 Jun 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Urology |
Effective:03 Nov 1975 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1970 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jun 1976 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 09 Jun 2015 |