THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 21:02:06 PM
Ballard, Betty Lorraine Harriett
CPSO#:
28178
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
02 Oct 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
28 May 1976
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
11-Jun-2022
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Betty Ballard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 19 2017
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Oshawa Clinic Group
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON L1H 1B9
Tel: (905) 721-8551
Date Received: 25 Sep 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 May 1976 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Oct 2017 |