THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 13:33:09 PM
Navarro, Margaret Elizabeth
CPSO#:
28157
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
11 Jan 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
18 May 1976
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Ruiz-Navarro, Margaret Elizabeth (used until: 26 Oct 1983 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1968
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: J. & M. Navarro Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 19 2018
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Records Access Services Canada Inc
854 Upper Canada Drive
Sarnia ON N7W 1A4
1 800 971 8038
Date Received: 11 Jan 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:01 Jan 1976 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 May 1976 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 11 Jan 2018 |