THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 15:22:24 PM
Gapski, John Andrew
CPSO#:
28156
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
13 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
17 Jun 1974
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Polish
Education: University of Ottawa, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: John Gapski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 7 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:2004 Stavebank Rd
Mississauga ON L5C 1T2
Date Received: 14 Jun 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:12 Nov 1979 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1974 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 May 1976 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 13 Jun 2019 |