THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 13:00:19 PM
Watson, Christopher Herbert Charles
CPSO#:
28136
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 May 1979
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 May 1979
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
Maple ON L6A 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-1212
Electoral District: 05
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical records can submit a written request to [email protected]
Date Received: 16 Mar 2017
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital |
Vaughan |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:16 Nov 1979 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER HERBERT CHARLES WATSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WATSON is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1974 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Apr 1976 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Oct 1977 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 May 1979 |