THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 20:39:28 PM
Juma, Zulfikar Amirali Hassan
CPSO#:
28082
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Sep 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Sep 1980
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Manchester Medical School, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Zulfikar Juma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 4 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:15 Nov 1977 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:26 Mar 1979 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Apr 1973 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Mar 1976 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 16 Apr 1980 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Sep 1980 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Sep 2020 |