THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 5:08:52 AM
Augustin, Jean Emmanuel
CPSO#:
28067
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Feb 1976
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Feb 1976
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Haiti, 1962
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
610 Av McConnell
Cornwall ON K6H 4M1
Phone: 6139355044
Fax: 6139388163
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Nov 1970 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JEAN EMMANUEL AUGUSTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AUGUSTIN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Public Service Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 1971 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 02 Aug 1972 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Specified Certificate |
Effective: 03 Aug 1973 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Apr 1974 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 May 1975 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Feb 1976 |