THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 7:37:37 AM
Boron, Susan Pearl
CPSO#:
28054
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
08 Jul 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
25 Apr 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Susan Boron Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 26 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Hanover Medical Associates
118 7th Ave
Hanover ON N4N 3L9
Date Received: 09 Jul 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1976 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1974 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Feb 1976 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 25 Apr 2018 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 25 Apr 2018 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 08 Jul 2019 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: April 25, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Susan Pearl Boron to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 25, 2018:
An assessment of Dr. Boron’s practice was conducted by the College. As a result of the assessment, upon her return to practice:
Dr. Boron will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for six months.
Dr. Boron will engage in professional education in record-keeping and documentation.
Dr. Boron’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within six months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.